Its not about speed and mental maths. Thats not the point. Obviously you need to show that you are comfortable with numbers.Take some extra seconds to do your calculations. Thats a better outcome than trying to do things quickly and getting the calcs wrong.
5% error margin is okay.
So, for calculations involving large numbers you can apply the following approaches:
- Increase the number of steps by expanding the numbers e.g 43*78= (40+3)*78= 40*78 + 3*78 = 40*70+ 40*8+ 3*78. Hope you get the point
- Round up or down and add % error, so in example above you can use 40*80
So, for a large number divided by 365, its okay to use 350 or 400 but make sure to compensate for the error % or you could expand the numerator in multiples of 365. E.g. 4568/365 = (365*12 + 188)/365