Hi,

There are several techniques that you can use:

1) **Learn how to work with zeros**. Best way - always use 10^power instead of zeros

Example:

300x9000 = 3*10ˆ2 x 9*10ˆ3=3x9*10ˆ(2+3)=27*10ˆ5

Handwritten it looks not that complicated. If you get used to writing all the numbers that way, you will never lose zeros and all multiplications/divisions will be replaced with + or -.

In your case, it will look like 63 * 10ˆ5 / 72 * 10ˆ2

**2) Learn how to multiply double digit numbers**

Pls check this video - https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=6ndkkPZYJHo It takes an hour to learn this method

**3) Learn how to divide the numbers fast**

**If you need the precise calculation **- **you can use the basic division technique, **calculating 630 / 72 * 10ˆ2 = 875

**If you don't need it precise -** **Learn the division table up to 1/11** (i.e. 5/6 = 83.3%). It will help you calculate any percentage problems

In your case, it will be roughly 6/7 * 10ˆ3 = 85.7 * 10ˆ3 or 857. Since I know that it was the rough calculation and the real number should be bigger, I would round the final result to 870

Best!