## Frage gesperrt

Diese Frage ist schreibgeschützt, da sie mit folgender Frage zusammengefügt wurde: Hi all - does anyone have any material to prep mental maths? Thanks a lot!.

6

# Math training - how do you do it?

Hi guys,

I have been using the Math Tool for a while now (easy/medium-random level) and I am really improving! Everything on the easy level is fine (matter of training) but I am looking for some math tricks on the medium-level questions.

So things to solve 1243/17=? or 1334*21, etc.

I struggle with the approach for these multiplications, and am aware there is some tricks for this. Any good websites you guys know of with tricks (metal math) to solve these questions?

Hi guys,

I have been using the Math Tool for a while now (easy/medium-random level) and I am really improving! Everything on the easy level is fine (matter of training) but I am looking for some math tricks on the medium-level questions.

So things to solve 1243/17=? or 1334*21, etc.

I struggle with the approach for these multiplications, and am aware there is some tricks for this. Any good websites you guys know of with tricks (metal math) to solve these questions?

6 Antworten

• Datum aufsteigend
• Datum absteigend

Thanks for the replies guys!

I know (and use) caseinterviewmath.com as well. A good website indeed, but only for practicing. They don't provide "tips and tricks" on how to solve sums like the aforementioned. Of course, one way is to use paper, and this might indeed be enough for cases. But if someone does know some "tips and tricks" I would love to hear of them (also, some of these tricks might have to be performed on paper as well).

An example of the tricks I am referring to:

- 227 : 5 = ? Instead of computing it the long way (7*5+20*5+200*5) you can multiple the first number by 10 (to make 2270) and than take half of it (1135, which is the answer). Goes for any division by 5 obviously.

- 19*18 = ? Although this one is easy to do the conventional way, an alternative is the trick of (1) adding the first digit of the lowest number to the highest number (= 8 +19 = 27), then (2) multiply this by 10 (= 27 * 10 = 270) and then (3) adding the product of the first two digits of both numbers (= 9 * 8 = 72), resulting in 270 + 72 = 342. This only works up to a multiplication of the numbers UNDER 20.

Thanks for the replies guys!

I know (and use) caseinterviewmath.com as well. A good website indeed, but only for practicing. They don't provide "tips and tricks" on how to solve sums like the aforementioned. Of course, one way is to use paper, and this might indeed be enough for cases. But if someone does know some "tips and tricks" I would love to hear of them (also, some of these tricks might have to be performed on paper as well).

An example of the tricks I am referring to:

- 227 : 5 = ? Instead of computing it the long way (7*5+20*5+200*5) you can multiple the first number by 10 (to make 2270) and than take half of it (1135, which is the answer). Goes for any division by 5 obviously.

- 19*18 = ? Although this one is easy to do the conventional way, an alternative is the trick of (1) adding the first digit of the lowest number to the highest number (= 8 +19 = 27), then (2) multiply this by 10 (= 27 * 10 = 270) and then (3) adding the product of the first two digits of both numbers (= 9 * 8 = 72), resulting in 270 + 72 = 342. This only works up to a multiplication of the numbers UNDER 20.

I would do this in another way: First calculate 18*20= 360 which is easy, and then subtract 18 from it 360-18 = 342 — Czuee am 5. Mär 2017

There are books that teach those kinds of tricks. It's been a while since I've read one, but Rapid Math Tricks is an example book. You might find it at a library.

There are books that teach those kinds of tricks. It's been a while since I've read one, but Rapid Math Tricks is an example book. You might find it at a library.

Are there math drills with equations on some website, or like how it is given in a case usually? Story to math.

Are there math drills with equations on some website, or like how it is given in a case usually? Story to math.

I think for problems like this it is entirely appropriate to just work it out on paper. You could try to whiz through it with mental math calculations but I simply work the calculations on paper.

I think for problems like this it is entirely appropriate to just work it out on paper. You could try to whiz through it with mental math calculations but I simply work the calculations on paper.

Make sure to use caseinterviewmath.com as well, great website (and free)

Make sure to use caseinterviewmath.com as well, great website (and free)

## Verwandte BootCamp-Artikel

### How to Read Charts and Data in Case Interviews

We explain and give tips on how to understand and analyze graphs, charts and data presented by interviewer to candidates in case interviews.

Quiz

### Guide to Improving Speed in Written Tests such as the PST

Follow these instructions to significantly improve your performance and speed in solving problem solving tests used at McKinsey, BCG and Bain.

### Math Skills Required in Case Interviews

Nearly all the math required in case interviews is arithmetic: addition, subtraction, multiplication and division. We help you do calculations with large numbers quickly and without calculators.

Quiz

### Fast Math: How to Master Mental Math

Apply these tips and tricks for outstanding mental math shortcuts to impress your interviewer in your next case interview.

Quiz

### Why Math matters

Your math skills will be tested in each and every consulting interview. So you better brush up mental math skills to succeed.

Quiz